ME LD73 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Require Bottled Water Companies to Monitor for Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances
Title
An Act to Require Bottled Water Companies to Monitor for Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-01-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |