ME LD726 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Make Sales to Area Agencies on Aging Tax-exempt

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Make Sales to Area Agencies on Aging Tax-exempt

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-04-18SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-11SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-04-11SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-56), in concurrence.
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-56) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-11SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-04-11SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-04HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-04HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-56).
2019-04-04HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-04-04HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-02-12SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
2019-02-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-12HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2019-02-12HouseCommittee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback