ME LD726 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Patient Safety in Maine's Medical Marijuana Program
Title
An Act To Increase Patient Safety in Maine's Medical Marijuana Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #611 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Accept Otp Rpt RC #593 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Accept Otp Rpt RC #593 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-451). |
2016-04-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-04-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-04-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 611 Yeas 27 - Nays 8 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-451) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-451) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-451) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 593 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Subsequently, the Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Report READ |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-10 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2015-03-05 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |