ME LD725 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 227 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 227 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Recognize Local Control Regarding Food Systems
Title
An Act To Recognize Local Control Regarding Food Systems
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Sen. David Miramant [D] |
Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Enactment RC #227 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #189 (Y: 108 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #110 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-31 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #189 (Y: 108 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #110 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 227 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-74) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-136). |
2017-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-136) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-74) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 189 (Yeas 108 - Nays 35 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-31 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-05-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-74) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-136) |
2017-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-74) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-136) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-74) Senate Amendment "A" (S-136) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-74) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-74) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 189 (Yeas 108 - Nays 35 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-31 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-25 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-05-25 | House | Representative BRYANT of Windham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-05-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-74) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-136) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Senate Amendment "A" (S-136) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-74) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Subsequently the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senator MASON of Androscoggin asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion for Reconsideration. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Same Senator to RECONSIDER whereby The Senate FAILED to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senator MASON of Androscoggin moved to RECONSIDER whereby The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 110 Yeas 16 - Nays 18 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-03-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-16 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-03-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-09 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-03-09 | House | On motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester, TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |