ME LD723 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Members present Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Reduce Volatility in State Pension Funding Requirements Caused by the Financial Markets

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Reduce Volatility in State Pension Funding Requirements Caused by the Financial Markets

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20SenateSubsequently FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Members present Required in concurrence
2017-07-20SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2017-06-06SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINALLY PASSED 2/3 Vote Required in concurrence
2017-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-05HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2017-06-05HouseThis being a Constitutional Amendment, in accordance with the provisions of Section 4 of Article X of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present was necessary.
2017-05-31HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-31HouseThe RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-148).
2017-05-31HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-05-31HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-05-30SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2017-05-30SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-148).
2017-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-148) READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-30SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-05-30SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-02-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-28HouseThe RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
2017-02-28SenateCommittee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback