ME LD721 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Mandate the Reporting of a Planned Act of Terrorism by a Person with Knowledge of That Plan
Title
An Act To Mandate the Reporting of a Planned Act of Terrorism by a Person with Knowledge of That Plan
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Rep. Aaron Frey [D] |
Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] | Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] | Rep. Stedman Seavey [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #454 (Y: 78 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-08-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #415 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #415 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-08-02 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 454V 78 having voted in the affirmative and 59 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-08-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-08-02 | Senate | LD 721 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 27 IN FAVOR and 7 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | In concurrence. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-114). |
2017-05-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-24 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-114). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-114) READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |