ME LD721 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Strengthen and Align the Services Provided to Maine's Veterans
Title
Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Strengthen and Align the Services Provided to Maine's Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #167 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Accept Report RC #141 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Accept Report RC #141 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) thereto |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-335) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) was ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On Motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence. |
2015-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 167 (Yeas 143 - Nays 0 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-08 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 141 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-03 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-255) |
2015-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cyrway of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs, in concurrence. |
2015-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-05 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |