ME LD715 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 74 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Make Certain Appropriations and Allocations and Changing Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Make Certain Appropriations and Allocations and Changing Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Enactment RC #74 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #73 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Commit RC #72 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - House - Enactment RC #24 (Y: 77 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Adopt Hah-55 To Cah-52 RC #23 (Y: 78 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #22 (Y: 78 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Commit To Afa RC #21 (Y: 64 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 74 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-03-30SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-03-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-03-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 24 (Yeas 77 - Nays 67 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2021-03-30HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-03-30SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-52) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-55) thereto in concurrence
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-52) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-55) thereto ADOPTED
2021-03-30SenateHouse Amendment "A" (H-55) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-52) READ and ADOPTED
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-52) READ
2021-03-30SenateREAD ONCE
2021-03-30SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 73 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-03-30SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland The Majority as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-52) Report ACCEPTED
2021-03-30SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 72 Yeas 13 - Nays 21 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 FAILED
2021-03-30SenateOn motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs
2021-03-30SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-52) Report ACCEPTED Roll Call Ordered
2021-03-30SenateReports READ
2021-03-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-03-30HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-52) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-55) thereto.
2021-03-30HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-03-30HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-52) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-55) thereto ADOPTED.
2021-03-30HouseOn motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, House Amendment "B" (H-58) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-52) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
2021-03-30HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Scarborough, House Amendment "B" (H-58) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-52) was READ.
2021-03-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 23 (Yeas 78 - Nays 66 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2021-03-30HouseOn motion of Representative PIERCE of Falmouth, House Amendment "A" (H-55) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-52) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-03-30HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-52) was READ.
2021-03-30HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-03-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 22 (Yeas 78 - Nays 66 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2021-03-30HouseSubsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-03-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 21 (Yeas 64 - Nays 78 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
2021-03-30HouseMotion of Representative MILLETT of Waterford to COMMIT the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS FAILED.
2021-03-30HouseRepresentative PIERCE of Falmouth moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2021-03-30HouseReports READ.
2021-03-27JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-03-25JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-03-25JointWork Session Held
2021-03-03HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-03-03HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on March 3, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=715&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0525&item=1&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0525&item=8&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0525&item=2&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0525&item=3&snum=130
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN071502.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN071503.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN071508.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079185&chamber=House&serialnumber=21
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079185&chamber=House&serialnumber=22
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079185&chamber=House&serialnumber=23
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079185&chamber=House&serialnumber=24
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079185&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=72
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079185&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=73
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079185&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=74

Bill Comments

feedback