ME LD712 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Increase the School Construction Debt Service Limit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Increase the School Construction Debt Service Limit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #117 (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #109 (Y: 88 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-29SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-28HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-23SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-290) in concurrence
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-290) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-23SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-23SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 117 Yeas 18 - Nays 13 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
2019-05-23SenateOn motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-05-23SenateReports Read
2019-05-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-21HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-290).
2019-05-21HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-21HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-290) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-21HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-21HouseROLL CALL NO. 109 (Yeas 88 - Nays 55 - Absent 5 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-21HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-21HouseReports READ.
2019-02-12SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2019-02-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-12HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2019-02-12HouseCommittee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback