ME LD710 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Maine Criminal Code and a Period of Suspension under the Motor Vehicle Statutes
Title
An Act Regarding the Maine Criminal Code and a Period of Suspension under the Motor Vehicle Statutes
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #400 (Y: 34 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 400V 34 having voted in the affirmative and 111 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2021-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2021-06-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-538), in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-538) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-538). |
2021-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-04-23 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-04-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-29 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed. |
2021-03-03 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 3, 2021. |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported by Representative WARREN for the Criminal Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 17-A, section 1354, subsection 2. |