ME LD705 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Improve Air Quality and Ventilation in Maine's Public Schools
Title
Resolve, To Improve Air Quality and Ventilation in Maine's Public Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Michael Brennan [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] |
Sen. Nicole Grohoski [D] | Rep. David McCrea [D] | Rep. Suzanne Salisbury [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #189 (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-455) in concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-455) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-455). |
2021-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-455) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 189 (Yeas 91 - Nays 47 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-04-06 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-02 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-02 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 2, 2021. |