ME LD704 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Notice Provided by Insurance Carriers to Health Care Providers
Title
An Act Regarding Notice Provided by Insurance Carriers to Health Care Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin , REFERRED to the Committee on Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence. |
2015-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=704&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0480&item=1&snum=127 |