ME LD702 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Filing Methods for Quarterly Payroll Reports
Title
An Act To Clarify Filing Methods for Quarterly Payroll Reports
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Herbig [D] | Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Sen. John Patrick [D] | Rep. Susan Austin [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Lockman [R] | Rep. Karleton Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-04-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin , REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence. |
2015-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |