ME LD701 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Probation and Remove References to the Intensive Supervision Program of the Department of Corrections
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Probation and Remove References to the Intensive Supervision Program of the Department of Corrections
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Rep. Ricky Long [R] | Sen. David Dutremble [D] | Sen. Mark Dion [D] |
Rep. Bryan Kaenrath [D] | Rep. Timothy Marks [D] | Rep. Jethro Pease [R] | Rep. Corey Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-44). |
2013-05-08 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2013-05-08 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-05-07 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-44) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-05-07 | House | On motion of Representative DION of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-44). |
2013-05-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-44) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator DUTREMBLE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-44) Report ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-02-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-26 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Jackson of Arostook REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed |