ME LD700 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Give Flexibility to Employees and Employers for Temporary Layoffs
Title
An Act To Give Flexibility to Employees and Employers for Temporary Layoffs
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Parry [R] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Sen. Ronald Collins [R] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] |
Rep. Michael Devin [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-09 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #731 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #720 (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #720 (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Senate | in concurrence |
2018-07-09 | Senate | LD 700 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 IN FAVOR and 1 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-07-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 720V 140 having voted in the affirmative and 3 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-07-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-06-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-21 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-456) and Senate Amendment "B" (S-521) thereto. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-456) AND Senate Amendment "B" (S-521) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-521) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-521) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) was ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-456) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-13 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-04-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-13 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-456) thereto. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-456) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-456) thereto ADOPTED |
2018-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-456) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-749) READ |
2018-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Subsequently Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Report READ |
2018-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-749). |
2018-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-04-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |