ME LD70 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow a Parent or Guardian of a Student Who Has Been Affected by COVID-19 To Keep the Student in the Student's Current Grade Level
Title
An Act To Allow a Parent or Guardian of a Student Who Has Been Affected by COVID-19 To Keep the Student in the Student's Current Grade Level
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Fecteau [R] | Rep. Gary Drinkwater [R] | Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] |
Rep. Shelley Rudnicki [R] | Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #27 (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 27 (Yeas 88 - Nays 57 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2021-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-03-30 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |