ME LD699 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, To Direct the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife To Conduct an Evaluation of Its Sport Fishing Program
Title
Resolve, To Direct the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife To Conduct an Evaluation of Its Sport Fishing Program
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Clark [D] | Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] | Rep. Jane Eberle [D] | Rep. Benjamin Pratt [D] |
Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Michael Shaw [D] | Sen. David Trahan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-07 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-05-05 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-149) in concurrence | |
2009-05-05 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-149) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-30 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-149) | |
2009-04-29 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Bryant of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |