ME LD698 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Allow School Budget Validation Referenda To Be Held on a Saturday
Title
An Act To Allow School Budget Validation Referenda To Be Held on a Saturday
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Sen. Peter Edgecomb [R] | Rep. Terry Hayes [D] | Sen. Dawn Hill [D] |
Rep. Gary Knight [R] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Wright Pinkham [R] | Rep. Diane Russell [D] |
Rep. Windol Weaver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-30 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-28 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2009-04-28 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-16 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-15 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-04-15 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-14 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |