ME LD696 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Notification of Adverse Changes to Prescription Drug Formularies in Health Plans
Title
An Act To Require Notification of Adverse Changes to Prescription Drug Formularies in Health Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - House - Enactment RC #672 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 672 (Yeas 135 - Nays 0 - Absent 16 - Excused 0) |
2018-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772). |
2018-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-04-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772). |
2018-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-04-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |