ME LD689 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Confer Categorical Eligibility for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Benefit Applications
Title
An Act To Confer Categorical Eligibility for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Benefit Applications
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Hamann [D] | Rep. Dale Denno [D] | Rep. Michael Devin [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] |
Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] | Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Rep. Jennifer Parker [D] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #217 (Y: 80 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-398). |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-398). |
2017-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-398) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 217 (Yeas 80 - Nays 66 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |