ME LD674 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Support Early Intervention and Treatment of Psychotic Disorders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Support Early Intervention and Treatment of Psychotic Disorders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
2021-06-08SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2021-06-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-07HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-07HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2021-06-03HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-03HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-132).
2021-06-03HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2021-06-03HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2021-06-03SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2021-06-03SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-132).
2021-06-03SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-132) READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-03SenateREAD ONCE.
2021-06-03SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2021-06-01JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2021-05-13JointVoted: OTP-AM
2021-05-13JointWork Session Held
2021-04-09JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate on March 2, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback