ME LD674 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Maine's Working Families
Title
An Act To Support Maine's Working Families
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Herbig [D] | Sen. John Patrick [D] | Rep. Dillon Bates [D] | Rep. James Campbell [R] |
Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Paul Gilbert [D] | Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #515 (Y: 78 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-05 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-24 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 515 (Yeas 78 - Nays 67 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2016-03-24 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-24 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-03-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-23 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Requested) |
2016-03-23 | House | On motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester TABLED pending the motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2016-03-23 | House | Representative HERBIG of Belfast moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2016-03-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence. |
2015-03-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2015-03-03 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |