ME LD673 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restore the Tip Credit to Maine's Minimum Wage Law
Title
An Act To Restore the Tip Credit to Maine's Minimum Wage Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #302 (Y: 110 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #246 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #246 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-518) in concurrence |
2017-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-21 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-21 | House | Subsequently, The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-518) thereto. |
2017-06-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-518) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2017-06-21 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-518) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-21 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the House RECEDED. |
2017-06-21 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-21 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-21 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-518) thereto. |
2017-06-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-518) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2017-06-21 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-518) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-21 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-209). |
2017-06-21 | House | On further motion of same Representative under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-209). |
2017-06-21 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the House RECEDED. |
2017-06-21 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-21 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2017-06-21 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-20 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-20 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | FAILED EMERGENCY ENACTMENT In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2017-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Bill FAILED ENACTMENT |
2017-06-15 | Senate | FAILED ENACTMENT |
2017-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-15 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-06-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-209). |
2017-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 302 (Yeas 110 - Nays 37 - Absent 3 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-209) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE Roll Call Number 246 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-02-28 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed |