ME LD672 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Direct the Department of Transportation To Use a Rail Corridor Use Advisory Council in Reviewing the Mountain Division Line for Potential Nonrail Uses
Title
Resolve, To Direct the Department of Transportation To Use a Rail Corridor Use Advisory Council in Reviewing the Mountain Division Line for Potential Nonrail Uses
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Kyle Bailey [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Rep. Lester Ordway [R] |
Rep. Nathan Wadsworth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-08 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-167). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-167). |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-167) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 2, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |