ME LD671 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Factor Conservative Projections of Sea Level Rise into State Planning on Climate Change
Title
An Act to Factor Conservative Projections of Sea Level Rise into State Planning on Climate Change
Sponsors
Rep. Sophia Warren [D] | Rep. Lydia Crafts [D] | Rep. Valli Geiger [D] | Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] |
Rep. Lynne Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-04-12 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-04-06 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-04-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2023-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=671&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0440&item=1&snum=131 |