ME LD670 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - LD 670 In Senate, June 23, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 In Favor and 1 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - LD 670 In Senate, June 23, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 In Favor and 1 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Unlawful Cutting of Trees
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Unlawful Cutting of Trees
Sponsors
Rep. Joan Welsh [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] |
Rep. Gay Grant [D] | Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #340 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #342 (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #342 (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | LD 670 In Senate, June 23, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 In Favor and 1 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 342V 108 having voted in the affirmative and 36 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-22 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-355), in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-355) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-355) |
2015-06-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2015-03-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-03-03 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |