ME LD668 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate the Return of Unclaimed Property
Title
An Act To Facilitate the Return of Unclaimed Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-03-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=668&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0230&item=1&snum=128 |