ME LD667 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal the Legalization of Recreational Marijuana
Title
An Act To Repeal the Legalization of Recreational Marijuana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #692 (Y: 73 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Ought To Pass RC #701 (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Ought To Pass RC #701 (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-07-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence |
2018-06-26 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-26 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2018-06-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 692 (Yeas 73 - Nays 49 - Absent 29 - Excused 0) |
2018-06-26 | House | The Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec Ought Not To Pass Accepted |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 701 Yeas 13 - Nays 18 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2018-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec Ought To Pass FAILED |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-06-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on June 21, 2018 pursuant to Joint Rule 309. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION. |
2018-05-02 | House | Carried over to the next special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-02-28 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION suggested and ordered printed |