ME LD660 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - RELEASED.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - RELEASED.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enhance Self-defense by Removing Restrictions on the Carrying and Use of Weapons
Title
An Act To Enhance Self-defense by Removing Restrictions on the Carrying and Use of Weapons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - RC #279 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #252 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #251 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-11 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #282 (Y: 74 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #252 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #251 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-11 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #282 (Y: 74 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | FAILED |
2013-06-13 | Senate | (14 -Yeas, 21 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Number 280 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Motion by KATZ of Kennebec Senator to RECONSIDER whereby the Senate ACCEPTED the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence FAILED. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator KATZ of Kennebec. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-12 | Senate | (21 -Yeas, 14 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Number 252 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | FAILED |
2013-06-12 | Senate | (16 -Yeas, 19 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Number 251 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Senator THIBODEAU of Waldo moved to TABLE this matter until Later in Today's Session, pending the motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence.. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence. (Remarks Made) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 282 (Yeas 74 - Nays 73 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-11 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-07 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-07 | House | Representative DION of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY, in concurrence. |
2013-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2013-02-26 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |