ME LD660 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Maintain Train Quiet Zone Status in Millinocket
Title
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Maintain Train Quiet Zone Status in Millinocket
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | (S) Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2009-03-12 | (S) On motion by Senator DAMON of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Representative MAZUREK from the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Damon of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |