ME LD656 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Prevent Electioneering on General Election Ballots by Candidates Nominated by Petition
Title
An Act to Prevent Electioneering on General Election Ballots by Candidates Nominated by Petition
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Morris [R] | Rep. Amy Arata [R] | Rep. Richard Bradstreet [R] | Rep. William Faulkingham [R] |
Rep. Randall Greenwood [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #108 (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #40 (Y: 76 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #40 (Y: 76 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 108 Yeas 23 - Nays 10 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-25 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 40 (Yeas 76 - Nays 66 - Absent 8 - Excused 0 - Vacant - 1) |
2023-04-25 | House | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-04-21 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-03-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |