ME LD647 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Certain Shellfish Certificates and Permits Issued by the Department of Marine Resources
Title
An Act Regarding Certain Shellfish Certificates and Permits Issued by the Department of Marine Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-334), in concurrence. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-334) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-334). |
2017-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |