ME LD647 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require the Department of Health and Human Services To Update Its Rules Governing Services for Children with Cognitive Impairments and Functional Limitations
Title
An Act To Require the Department of Health and Human Services To Update Its Rules Governing Services for Children with Cognitive Impairments and Functional Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #328 (Y: 86 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #310 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #151 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #310 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #151 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-06-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 328V 86 having voted in the affirmative and 60 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2015-06-22 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | LD 647 In Senate, June 22, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-193). |
2015-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-193) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-193) |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-193) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 151 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-03-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-03 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2015-03-03 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |