ME LD643 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Increase Reimbursement Rates for Home-based and Community-based Services
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Increase Reimbursement Rates for Home-based and Community-based Services
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Espling [R] | Rep. Richard Bradstreet [R] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] |
Rep. Frances Head [R] | Rep. Lester Ordway [R] | Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] | Rep. Joel Stetkis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-176) in concurrence |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-176) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-176). |
2017-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |