ME LD640 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Legal Representation in Certain Eviction Actions
Title
An Act Regarding Legal Representation in Certain Eviction Actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-56) |
2013-05-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-56). |
2013-05-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-56) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-02-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed |