ME LD636 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Establish the Work Group To Study the Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement Officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Establish the Work Group To Study the Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Study Table to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Study Table to any Special or Regular Session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-11SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
2019-06-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-11HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2019-06-10HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-10HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-236).
2019-06-10HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-10HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-236) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-10HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-10HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-10HouseReports READ.
2019-06-07SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-236)
2019-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-236) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-07SenateReports Read
2019-02-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-07HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2019-02-07SenateCommittee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback