ME LD628 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Businesses and Civic and Religious Organizations from Actions Taken Pursuant to an Emergency Proclamation
Title
An Act To Protect Businesses and Civic and Religious Organizations from Actions Taken Pursuant to an Emergency Proclamation
Sponsors
Rep. Meldon Carmichael [R] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] | Rep. John Ducharme [R] | Rep. Jeffery Gifford [R] |
Rep. Abigail Griffin [R] | Rep. Richard Mason [R] | Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] | Rep. Nathan Wadsworth [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #64 (Y: 80 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 64 (Yeas 80 - Nays 62 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-26 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-25 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 25, 2021. |