ME LD628 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Municipal Subdivision Laws
Title
An Act To Amend the Municipal Subdivision Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin the Minority Ought to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2017-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=628&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0444&item=1&snum=128 |