ME LD625 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing a Review of Crucial Needs and Lapses in Responding to and Preventing Sexual Trauma in the Maine National Guard
Title
Resolve, Directing a Review of Crucial Needs and Lapses in Responding to and Preventing Sexual Trauma in the Maine National Guard
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Rielly [D] | Rep. Christopher Caiazzo [D] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Sen. Louis Luchini [D] |
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] | Rep. Barbara Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-59), in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-59) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-59). |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-30 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-24 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-03-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-25 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-25 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 25, 2021. |