ME LD625 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, To Ensure All Children Covered by MaineCare Receive Early and Periodic Screening, Diagnosis and Treatment Services
Title
Resolve, To Ensure All Children Covered by MaineCare Receive Early and Periodic Screening, Diagnosis and Treatment Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-04-15 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2009-04-15 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-14 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-04-09 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Brannigan of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |