ME LD623 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Charter of the City of Brewer High School District
Title
An Act To Amend the Charter of the City of Brewer High School District
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Verow [D] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Sen. Peter Lyford [R] |
Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R] | Rep. Stephen Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-18 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-71), in concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-71) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-71). |
2019-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |