ME LD617 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Foster Career and Technical Education in Maine Schools by Creating an Additional Pathway to Certify Industrial Arts Teachers
Title
An Act to Foster Career and Technical Education in Maine Schools by Creating an Additional Pathway to Certify Industrial Arts Teachers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-03 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=617&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0394&item=1&snum=131 |