ME LD611 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend Certain Laws Affecting the Judicial Branch
Title
An Act To Amend Certain Laws Affecting the Judicial Branch
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-292), in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-292) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-292). |
2017-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |