ME LD609 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Involuntary Hospitalization Procedures
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Involuntary Hospitalization Procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Mills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-228) | |
2009-05-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-228) | |
2009-05-28 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-228) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-05-27 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-02-17 | (S) On motion by Senator Brannigan of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES | |
2009-02-17 | (S) Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |