ME LD608 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Assist Small Distilleries That Also Have Off-premises Retail Licenses
Title
An Act To Assist Small Distilleries That Also Have Off-premises Retail Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-416), in concurrence.. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-416) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-416). |
2013-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-416) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator Tuttle of York, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-02-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-02-21 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |