ME LD603 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) 17 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) 17 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Require Approval by a 2/3 Vote of Each Branch of the Legislature in Order To Raise a Tax or Impose a New Tax
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Require Approval by a 2/3 Vote of Each Branch of the Legislature in Order To Raise a Tax or Impose a New Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | (S) 17 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-06-28 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE (Remarks Made) Failed final passage On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 284 | |
2011-06-08 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2011-06-07 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock Tabled Later Today Assigned pending FINAL PASSAGE in non concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 132 (Yeas 75 - Nays 69 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-06-07 | (H) This being a Constitutional Amendment, a two-thirds vote of the House being necessary, a total was taken. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. | |
2011-06-06 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-06 | (H) The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-230). | |
2011-06-06 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2011-06-06 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-230) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-06-06 | (H) The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. | |
2011-06-06 | (H) On motion of Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-06-06 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-06-03 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-230) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-06-03 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-230) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-06-03 | (S) read once | |
2011-06-03 | (S) 20 Yeas - 14 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-06-03 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President ProTem (Remarks Made) On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 159 | |
2011-06-03 | (S) reports read On motion by Senator PLOWMAN of Penobscot Tabled Later Today Assigned pending motion by Same Senator to accept the majority ought to pass as amended by committee amendment "a" (s-230) report | |
2011-02-17 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) RESOLUTION REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-02-17 | (S) On motion by Senator Trahan of Lincoln REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION | |
2011-02-17 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Committee on TAXATION |