ME LD60 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Require a 72-hour Waiting Period After the Sale of a Firearm
Title
An Act to Require a 72-hour Waiting Period After the Sale of a Firearm
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Rep. Poppy Arford [D] | Rep. Lydia Crafts [D] | Rep. Janice Dodge [D] |
Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] | Rep. Bruce White [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #354 (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-13 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #201 (Y: 69 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-06-13 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #201 (Y: 69 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 354 Yeas 11 - Nays 24 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox moved to Accept The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 201 (Yeas 69 - Nays 73 - Absent 7 - Excused 1 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-13 | House | Motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2023-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-01-04 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2023-01-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-01-04 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |