ME LD6 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Prohibit Insurance Carriers from Charging Enrollees for Prescription Drugs in Amounts That Exceed the Drugs' Costs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Prohibit Insurance Carriers from Charging Enrollees for Prescription Drugs in Amounts That Exceed the Drugs' Costs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Enactment RC #58 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-04-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-27HouseROLL CALL NO. 58 (Yeas 144 - Nays 0 - Absent 6 - Excused 1)
2017-04-27HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-04-25HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-25HouseSubsequently, The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-22) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-40) thereto.
2017-04-25HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-04-25HouseLater today assigned.
2017-04-25HouseOn motion of Representative BROOKS of Lewiston, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-22) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-40) thereto.
2017-04-25HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-04-25HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-22) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-40) thereto ADOPTED.
2017-04-25HouseSenate Amendment "A" (S-40) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-22) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-04-25HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-22) was READ.
2017-04-25HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-04-25HouseReport was READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-04-20SenateSent down for concurrence
2017-04-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-22) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-40) thereto
2017-04-20SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-22) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-40) thereto ADOPTED
2017-04-20SenateOn motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-40) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-22) READ and ADOPTED
2017-04-20SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-22) was ADOPTED
2017-04-20SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-04-19SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-18SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-13SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-13SenateOn motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-22)
2017-04-13SenateREAD A SECOND TIME
2017-04-13SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2017-04-11SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2017-04-11SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-22) READ and ADOPTED
2017-04-11SenateREAD ONCE
2017-04-11SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2017-01-05HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-05HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2017-01-05SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-01-05SenateREFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
2017-01-05SenateCommittee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback