ME LD6 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Establish a Distracted Driver Law
Title
An Act To Establish a Distracted Driver Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-12 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-12 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland taken from the Special Appropriations Table | |
2009-05-13 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2009-05-13 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-13 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-07 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-07 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-126) | |
2009-05-07 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-07 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-06 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-126) | |
2009-05-06 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-126) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-05-05 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-01-21 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2009-01-15 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2009-01-15 | (S) On motion by Senator Damon of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-01-15 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-01-13 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-08 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-01-08 | (S) On motion by Senator DAMON of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE | |
2009-01-08 | (S) Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |