ME LD598 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 757 Yeas 26 - Nays 6 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 757 Yeas 26 - Nays 6 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Discrimination in Employment and School Based on Hair Texture or Hairstyle
Title
An Act To Prohibit Discrimination in Employment and School Based on Hair Texture or Hairstyle
Sponsors
Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Kristen Cloutier [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] |
Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-15 - Senate - Enactment RC #757 (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp Rpt RC #663 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp Rpt RC #663 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 757 Yeas 26 - Nays 6 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-03-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-31 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-31 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2022-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 663 Yeas 21 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2022-03-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 25, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |